Charles Tupper - Charlottetown, Prince Edward Island, Canada
Posted by: neoc1
N 46° 14.075 W 063° 07.646
20T E 490174 N 5120119
A statue of Charles Tupper, the former Premier of Nova Scotia and one of the Fathers of Confederation, is located in the Confederation Centre of the Arts at 145 Richmond Street Charlottetown, PEI, Canada.
Waymark Code: WM16YPV
Location: Prince Edward Island, Canada
Date Posted: 11/01/2022
Views: 1
A life-size white stone statue of Charles Tupper stands on a circular stone base. Tupper has long bushy sideburns and is depicted wearing a knee length overcoat, a waistcoat, bow tie, trousers and shoes. He is standing with his left foot forward and his arms are folded across his chest.
A plaque on the circular base is inscribed:
Charles Tupper
Nova Scotia
Nouvelle-Écosse
An oval plaque next to his statue contains his portrait from the National Archives of Canada and the following inscription:
Charles Tupper
PREMIER PREMIER MINISTRE
Nova Scotia Nouvelle-Écosse
Charles Tupper and the Nova Scotia
delegates were open to either a Maritime
or a federal union. Tupper was the first
to propose that opposition members
attend the conference-making it a
parliamentary-style discussion
not a partisan affair.
Charles Tupper et les délégués de la
Nouvelle-Ecosse sont tout aussi
ouverts à l'idée d'une union des
Maritimes qu'à une union fédérale.
Il est le premier à proposer que les
membres de l'opposition participent
à la Conférence, favorisant ainsi des
échanges parlementaires plutôt
que l'esprit partisan.
Age: 43
Political Party: Conservative
Profession: Physician, Politician
Age : 43
Parti politique : Conservateur
Profession : médecin, politicien
|
Charles Tupper was born on July 2, 1821 in Amherst, Nova Scotia. He received an M.D. degree from the University of Edinburgh Medical School in 1843. He returned to Amherst, Nova Scotia where he practiced medicine and owned a pharmacy.
He was the Premier of the Colony of Nova Scotia from May 11, 1864 to July 3, 1867, a member of parliament from 1887 to 1888 and from 1896 to 1901, Minister of Finance and Receiver General from
January 27, 1887 to May 22, 1888, Canadian High Commissioner to the United Kingdom from May 30, 1883 to January 15, 1896, Secretary of State for Canada from January 15, 1896 to July 8, 1896, and 6th Prime Minister of Canada from May 1, 1896 to July 8, 1896.