The Parish Church of All Saints Odd Rode is an active Anglican parish church in the deanery of Congleton, the archdeaconry of Macclesfield, and the diocese of Chester.
All Saints' is an attractive rural church that was built in 1864. It is a Grade II* listed building that contains some fine architectural and decorative elements, which make it of considerable historical interest.
The description of the Grade II* listed church by Historic England can be seen at the following link: (
visit link)
The church was commissioned by Randle Wilbraham III of Rode Hall and designed by George Gilbert Scott. The foundation stone was laid in June 1863 and the builder was John Gallimore from Newcastle-under-Lyme. Stone was used from the quarries of Mow Cop and Kerridge at Macclesfield. Gallimore, who was also a joiner, made the timber roof, which Gilbert Scott likened to the ribs of a ship. He also made the pews to the architect’s design.
The family had worshipped at St Mary's Church, Astbury, but Randle III wanted to have a church in Odd Rode. He had previously bought an old chapel in the parish for the purpose, but this was too small, and in 1861 he commissioned Scott to design a new church. Building began in 1863, but Randle III died during the first year of construction, and the church was completed and paid for by his son, Randle Wilbraham IV. It cost nearly £5,914, and was dedicated in 1864. Source: (
visit link)
Sir Randle John Baker Wilbraham, 7th DL.JP. was born on 31 March 1906. He was the son of Sir Philip Wilbraham Baker Wilbraham, 6th Bt. and Joyce Christabel Kennaway. He married Betty Ann Torrens, daughter of Matt Torrens and Lilian Edith Fardell, on 26th February 1930. He died on 24th February 1980 at aged 73.
He was educated at Harrow School, Harrow, London, England. He graduated from Balliol College, Oxford University, Oxford, Oxfordshire, England, in 1928 with a Bachelor of Arts (B.A.). He gained the rank of Squadron Leader in the Royal Auxiliary Air Force. He fought in the Second World War. He held the office of High Sheriff of Cheshire in 1953. He held the office of Justice of the Peace (J.P.) for Cheshire in 1954. He held the office of High Steward of Congleton. He succeeded as the 7th Baronet Baker, of Loventor in Totnes, Devon [G.B., 1776] on 11th October 1957. He was President of the Chartered Land Agents' Society in 1958. He held the office of Deputy Lieutenant (D.L.) of Cheshire in 1959. SOURCE: (
visit link)