Lawrence Bridger - St John the Evangelist - Slimbridge, Gloucestershire
Posted by: SMacB
N 51° 43.814 W 002° 22.623
30U E 543022 N 5731219
A window in the North wall of the chancel of St. John the Evangelist Church in Slimbridge, with family coat of arms dedicated in memory of Lawrence Bridger who was Rector 1577 - 1630.
Waymark Code: WMY4N7
Location: South West England, United Kingdom
Date Posted: 04/21/2018
Views: 0
A window in the North wall of the chancel of St. John the Evangelist Church in Slimbridge, with family coat of arms dedicated in memory of Lawrence Bridger who was Rector 1577 - 1630.
"Lawrence was born in 1550 at Godalming and entered Oxford in 1568 where he was, elected a fellow of Magdalen College before receiving his B.A. in 1570, and then an M.A. in 1577. He was recommended to the office of Rector and Clerk of Slimbridge by the President of Magdalen with the approval of the Bishop of Gloucester. He was invested with the office by Queen Elizabeth at Windsor Castle on October 11 1577. In 1586 Lawrence was installed as a Prebend of the 3rd stall at Gloucester Cathedral, a post which he held until resigning in 1625. John Smyth (1567 - 1640) a stewart to the Berkeleys wrote in 'The Berkeley Manuscripts', in volume 3 page 203 that he sold Gossington Hall to Lawrence Bridger, clerke parson of Slimbridge , with 60 acres of land. Smyth also wrote that Lawrence was one of 'the persons charged to finde horses for the trayned band under Sir Gabriell Lowe, Knight, and Captaine of Dragoons of Berkeley Hundred in Anno 1626'. In what is a rather nice epitaph Smyth says that Lawrence died 'a very rich and honest man'. Lawrence married twice but died in 1630 a widower. In his will he makes bequests to nine children, Samuel, Lawrence, Joseph, Benjamin, Arthur, Elizabeth, Faith, Mary, and Anne with Samuel being the eldest son by his first wife and Joseph the eldest by his second wife, neither wife having so far been identified.
His favorite son, Joseph, was the eldest from the second marriage. To son Joseph he willed the Gossington Estate.
The eldest son by the first wife was Samuel. Samuel received other lands and a stern admonition from his father written into the will:
"If my son Samuel shall lay any claim or pretend any right unto any lands given to Joseph that all land I have given him (Samuel) shall return to my son Joseph and his heirs forever". Lawrence Bridger's will was dated 24 Sept 1630, probated 30 June 1631.
On June 30th 1996 a new window in the North wall of the chancel and adjacent to the altar of St. John the Evangelist Church in Slimbridge was dedicated in memory of Lawrence Bridger who was Rector 1577 - 1630. The Dean of Chapel and choir of Magdalen College, Oxford, took part in the service. The window, which incorporates the Bridger coat of arms (' ar, a cheveron engraved, sa, between three crabs, gu.') was made possible by the generosity of American descendants, several of whom attended the ceremony."
SOURCE - (
visit link)
See also - (
visit link) (pdf)