Admiral John Henry Towers (Jack) - His statue stands at ease, holding his gloves in his left hand, dressed in a WWI Naval Aviators Officers uniform.
The life-size bronze sculpture, is displayed standing on a I meter square black marble plinth, engraved with text on two sides.
Located at the Naval Aviation School which he founded in 1914.
Displayed in the outdoor Museum area. Pensacola, Florida, USA.
USS Towers (DDG-9) was a Charles F. Adams-class guided missile destroyer of the United States Navy notable for action in the Vietnam War. The ship was named in honor of Admiral John Henry Towers.
"John Henry Towers (January 30, 1885 – April 30, 1955) was a United States Navy admiral and pioneer naval aviator. He made important contributions to the technical and organizational development of naval aviation from its very beginnings, eventually serving as Chief of the Bureau of Aeronautics (1939–1942). He commanded carrier task forces during World War II, and retired in December 1947. He and Marc Mitscher were the only early Naval Aviation pioneers to survive the extreme hazards of early flight to remain with naval aviation throughout their careers. He was the first naval aviator to achieve flag rank and was the most senior advocate for naval aviation during a time when the Navy was dominated by battleship admirals. Towers spent his last years supporting aeronautical research and advising the aviation industry."
Text Sources: (
visit link) & (
visit link)
& (
visit link)
Service Record & Timeline:
1885-1-30
Born at Rome, Georgia
1906
Midshipman
Graduates from Naval Academy
1908
Ensign
BB Kentucky
1909
BB Michigan
1911
Flight training
1914-1
Executive officer, Naval Air Station Pensacola
1914-8
Assistant naval attaché, London
1916
Assistant Director of Naval Aviation
1919
Executive officer, CM Aroostook
1921
Commander, DD Mugford
1922
Executive officer, Naval Air Station Pensacola
1923-3
Assistant naval attaché, London, Paris, Rome, the Hague, and Berlin
1925
Bureau of Aeronautics
1927-1
Captain
Commander, CV Langley
1929
Head, Plans Division, Bureau of Aeronautics
1931-6
Staff, Aircraft, Battle Force
1933
Naval War College
1936
Commander, Naval Air Station San Diego
1938
Staff, Aircraft, Battle Force
1939
Commander, CV Saratoga
1939-6-1
Rear admiral
Chief, Bureau of Aeronautics
1942-10-14
Vice admiral
Commander, Naval Air Force, Pacific Fleet
1944-2-28
Deputy commander, Pacific Ocean Areas and Pacific Fleet
1945-8
Commander, 2 Fast Carrier Task Force
1945-11-7
Commander, 5 Fleet
1946-2-1
Commander, Pacific Fleet
1947-3
Chair, General Board
1947-12-1
Retires
1955-4-30
Dies at St. Alban's Hospital, Jamaica, New York "
Text Source: (
visit link)