THE PLAQUE"Monumento aos ex combatentes do vale do Vizela
Inaugurado pelo Presidente da Câmara Municipal de Vizela,
Dinis Manuel da Silva Costa em 22 de Junho de 2013""Monument to former combatants of the Vizela Valley
Inaugurated by the Mayor of the City of Vizela,
Dinis Manuel da Silva Costa on June 22, 2013"WHAT WAS INAUGURATEDIt was opened in 2013 a new monument to the former combatants in war of the Vizela valley which replaced an old one that existed in the same location.
The monument is located in the Manuel Faria garden in the main square of the city and in of of the sides it has a silhouette of a soldier and on the other a plaque with the names of the soldiers that died in combat.
The plaque Reads:
"Homage from the city of Vizela to the soldiers of the Freguesias of the county, particularly to the fallen in the war fronts, in all times and around the world.
Here wistfully recall
... Names of the soldiers ..." WHO INAUGURATED IT"Dinis Manuel da Silva Costa was born on January 18, 1957, in the freguesia of Caldas de Vizela S. João, Vizela municipality. He is married, father of one son and resides currently in the Freguesia of Caldas de Vizela S. Miguel.
With an academic background of the old 7th grade level in high school, Dinis Costa began his professional activity in CERCIGUI as monitor, in November 1978, having received training in Language for the Deaf / Mute in the Institute Antonio Candido, in Porto.
In the 1987 elections he ran to the elections of the Freguesia of S. Miguel by the Socialist Party, and won by absolute majority, a feat that was achieved in all the elections until 2001.
Its political action continued in December 2001 when he was elected Deputy Mayor of Vizela municipality, by the list of PS, assuming the responsibilities of Municipal Works, Environment, Traffic and Trade and Markets.
In the October 2005 elections, he ran again by the socialist party list, having been appointed Vice President, keeping under his responsibility the same responsibilities of the previous mandate.
Dinis Costa become mayor of Vizela in July 20, 2009, replacing his predecessor that had suspended his term.
in the October of 2009 elections, he was elected by the Socialist Party, Mayor of Vizela, for the term 2009/2013.
In the September 2013 elections, was elected by the Socialist Party, for second term as Mayor of Vizela, for mandate 2013/2017.
Adapted from: (
visit link)